Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1588 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14994 Week
» 68010 Month
» 187537 Year
» 3214390 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1278 |
m/e |
09/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8278 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4683 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
64683 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J20 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
M87 |
To Service |
During 09/1922 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1959 |
Service Life |
37 yrs , 2 mths |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1922 |
CAM |
|
Cambridge |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31B |
|
March |
w/e |
12/05/1951 |
31B |
|
March |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
31A |
|
Cambridge |
4w/e |
20/10/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
w/e |
12/05/1951 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
w/e |
20/10/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/09/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1922 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1278 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8278 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4683 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cambridge (CAM) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64683 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
19/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64683 |
|
|