Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3531 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16937 Week
» 69953 Month
» 189480 Year
» 3216333 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1285 |
m/e |
12/1922 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8285 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4690 |
m/e |
02/1946 |
British Railways |
64690 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J20 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
Y87 |
To Service |
During 12/1922 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1922 |
MAR |
|
March |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
STR |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
14/02/1948 |
31B |
|
March |
4w/e |
23/01/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
14/02/1948 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
23/01/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/03/1963 |
Doncaster Works (Scrap Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. |
SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 |
Worcester Works (Scrap Yard) |
4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1922 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1285 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8285 |
|
|
02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4690 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
14/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64690 |
|
|
23/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64690 |
|
|