|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1908 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1030 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18365 |
||
04/1942 | Modification | Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted | ||
24/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5820 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN) | ||
05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65820 | ||
04/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
07/1953 | Modification | Modification: LNER Diagram 57 Boiler Fitted | ||
04/1957 | Modification | Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted | ||
23/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
12/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
06/05/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65820 | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |