|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/09/1956 | Sunderland MPD | On the occasion of the visit to Sunderland shed on the 15th September, the following locomotives were seen: 65662, 65840, 65893, 67343, 69853, 65785, 65841, 67270, 68016, 69857, 65798, 65843, 67294, 68048, 69863, 65823, 65847, 67298, 68058, 65832, 65854, 67318, 68698, 65833, 65871, 67321, 69002, 65835, 65872, 67338, 69007, 65836, 65878, 67342 an 69101. The roundhouse presented a rather unusual spectacle these days, in that with the exception of two J94 locos., all the remainder were ex N.E.R. locomotives. The roof of the roundhouse is partly dismantled and it is understood that the roundhouse is to be rebuilt as a straight road shed. | SLS/195611 |
05/11/1966 | Allocation of J27 class (Sunderland) | North Blyth: 65804/34/8/92; South Blyth: 65789/95, 65811/2/3/23/42/55/60/1/9/79/82; Sunderland: 65817/33/5/53/65/72/80/5/94. | SLS/196701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1909 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1056 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3355 |
||
06/1945 | Modification | Modification: LNER Diagram 57A Boiler Fitted | ||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5833 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65833 | ||
15/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
20/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
07/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
01/05/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65833 | ||
08/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |