Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1796 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15202 Week
» 68218 Month
» 187745 Year
» 3214598 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
200 |
m/e |
09/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9200 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4487 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64487 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J35 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L347 |
Works Number |
18883 |
To Service |
During 09/1909 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 22/04/1960 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys |
Information |
Queen's Park Works |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1909 |
DFU |
|
Dunfermline Upper |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/04/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
30/05/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
22/04/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1947 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/06/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
Engines into shops: 5282, 5323, 61543, 61560, 62241, 62255, 64466, 64477, 64487, 65236, 65306, 65340, and (L.M.S) 14447, 17326, 44312, 57337. |
SLS/195008 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1909 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 200 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18883 |
|
|
08/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9200 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4487 |
|
|
07/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64487 |
|
|
22/04/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64487 |
|
|