Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2713 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16119 Week
» 69135 Month
» 188662 Year
» 3215515 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
370 |
m/e |
12/1909 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9370 |
m/e |
09/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4500 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
64500 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1909 |
THJ |
|
Thornton Junction |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
64C |
|
Dalry Road |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
09/06/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64C |
Dalry Road |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/06/1961 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1947 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/08/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60888, 4500, 64502, 5345, 68710, ex L.M.S. 603, 17263, 17350/69. |
SLS/194910 |
31/10/1949 |
Inverurie Works |
Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61508/24, 62240/60/65, 64466/71, 64500, 4531, 5229, 65279, 68192, ex-L.M.S. 44254, 4324, 15136, 17251, 17359, 17450/51. |
SLS/194912 |
09/08/1958 |
Edinburgh Dalry Road - stored locomotives |
55165/202/33, also 64500/17 and 69187 'out of use.' |
SLS/195810 |
05/05/1962 |
Bathgate MPD |
Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. |
SLS/196206 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1909 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 370 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18961 |
|
|
09/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9370 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4500 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64500 |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) |
|
|
09/06/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64500 |
|
|