Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 4172 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17578 Week
» 70594 Month
» 190121 Year
» 3216974 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
673 |
m/e |
12/1891 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9673 |
m/e |
08/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5243 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
65243 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1891 |
|
|
Loaned out of Service to the WD/ROD |
m/e |
11/1917 |
|
|
Returned from Service with the WD/ROD |
m/e |
06/1919 |
HAY |
|
Haymarket |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
64C |
|
Dalry Road |
4w/e |
05/10/1963 |
64F |
|
Bathgate |
4w/e |
25/01/1964 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/07/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
64C |
Dalry Road |
on |
08/09/1963 |
ALLOC |
64C |
Dalry Road |
5w/e |
12/10/1963 |
ALLOC |
64F |
Bathgate |
3w/e |
01/02/1964 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/07/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1915 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
12/1915 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1891 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 673 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4392 Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1915 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
12/1915 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
11/1917 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
06/1919 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
06/1919 |
Naming |
Named 'MAUDE' |
|
|
08/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9673 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5243 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Haymarket (HAY) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Naming |
Renamed 'MAUDE' |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65243 |
|
|
02/1960 |
Naming |
Renamed 'MAUDE' |
|
|
02/1960 |
Naming |
Renamed 'MAUDE' |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) |
|
|
25/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
14/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65243 from Bathgate (64F) |
|
|