Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 3538 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17581 Week
» 82535 Month
» 285199 Year
» 3312052 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
357 |
m/e |
07/1892 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9357 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5266 |
on |
23/03/1946 |
British Railways |
65266 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 07/1892 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 21/05/1962 off Kipps (65E) |
Service Life |
69 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1892 |
KPS |
|
Kipps |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
21/05/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/05/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1919 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
11/1919 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/07/1962 |
Inverurie Works (Condemned) |
In Shops: 42832, 55173, 57451, 64533/62, 64613/4/9, 65920. Awaiting Shops: 44016, D6142/4/7. Shopped during four weeks ending 30th June : 64537/47/79, 64606/25, 65297, 65319, D362, D2410, D5314, D6148/54, D8032. Condemned during four weeks ending 30th June: 40614, 55232, 64533/78, 65266/80, 65318/30, 69137. |
SLS/196208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1892 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 357 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1919 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1919 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9357 |
|
|
23/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5266 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kipps (KPS) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65266 |
|
|
21/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65266 from Kipps (65E) |
|
|
07/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|