Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 498 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18301 Week
» 71317 Month
» 190844 Year
» 3217697 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
746 |
m/e |
10/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9746 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5304 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
65304 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
M. Holmes |
Class |
J36 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 10/1898 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 08/10/1962 off Stirling (STG) |
Service Life |
64 yrs , 8 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
66A |
Polmadie |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
ALLOC |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
ALLOC |
61C |
Keith |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
ALLOC |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
ALLOC |
65J |
Stirling |
2w/e |
07/10/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1921 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
11/1921 |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted (Round Top firebox) |
12/1944 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
12/1944 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/06/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Scrapped) |
In Works: 42273, 45176, 61076, 61103, D8032. Shopped in four weeks ending 7th June : 64588, D362, D6155, 44960, 65930, 61404. Scrapped in same period: 64581, 65217/57/304, 64822, 65928; 64499, 65237. Being scrapped: 57617/31, 68346, 90077/575. Awaiting scrapping or shopping-64599/600, 64795, 64950/86. 64946 was waiting at Kittybrewster. |
SLS/196307 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1898 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 746 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1921 |
Modification |
Diagram 81 boiler fitted |
|
|
11/1921 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted |
|
|
07/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9746 |
|
|
12/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5304 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65304 |
|
|
22/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
13/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
26/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stirling (65J) |
|
|
08/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65304 from Stirling (STG) |
|
|
05/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|