|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) | Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). | SLS/195206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1900 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 791 Built at Cowlairs Works Diagram (unknown) boiler fitted |
||
02/1920 | Modification | Diagram 81 boiler fitted | ||
02/1920 | Modification | Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted | ||
08/1926 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9791 | ||
04/1930 | Modification | Modification: Steam Brakes fitted | ||
04/1930 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed | ||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Reedsmouth (Twd) | ||
12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5343 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA) | ||
26/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
28/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kipps (65E) | ||
19/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kipps (65E) | ||
03/1952 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65343 | ||
18/02/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 65343 from Kipps (65E) | ||
04/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |