|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/07/1961 | Inverurie Works (Erecting Shops) | Erecting Shops: D261, D2421, D3552, D6138/48, 43902, 44194, 44257, 64616/23, 65282, 65309/29. Waiting Works : 55185, 62479, 64494, 64612, 65261/81, 65900. Scrap Yard: 40574/94, 40688, 43868, 54475/83/8, 55198, 56240/6, 57232, 57324, 57552, 57609, 62474, 64471/82, 65276/95, 68459/71, 69136. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1921 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 175 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22676 |
||
01/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9175 | ||
06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4623 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) | ||
10/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64623 | ||
28/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmont (65K) | ||
30/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) | ||
31/10/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) | ||
18/11/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
19/11/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 64623 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
02/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |