Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1655 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15061 Week
» 68077 Month
» 187604 Year
» 3214457 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
517 |
m/e |
06/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9517 |
m/e |
04/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4630 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
64630 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J37 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
To Service |
During 06/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 06/09/1962 off Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 3 mths , 6 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
06/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/03/1962 |
Inverurie Works |
Awaiting shopping-44328, 64553, 64572 an 90455; shopped during last four weeks-44189, 64630, 65323/7; cut-up during last five weeks-55222/6/7/33, 56305, 57233/46/57, 57429, an 40619. Boilers and fireboxes in 'cemetery'-40574/94/603/18/9/50/63, 44319, 54491/3, 55198, 55207/8/15/6/22/6/7/30, 56305, 57257/349/429/552/4/85, 65246 an 68459. |
SLS/196204 |
15/10/1962 |
Inverurie Works |
In shops: 45461, 64595, 65910; waiting: 80093. Awaiting scrapping: 44008, 47168, 47536, 57331/378/613, 65313, 69204. Scrapped five weeks ended 12/10; 57445/671, 64598/607, 64604/30, 64480/637/794. |
SLS/196211 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1921 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 517 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
04/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9517 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4630 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dunfermline Upper (DFU) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64630 |
|
|
09/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|
06/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64630 from Dunfermline Upper (62C) |
|
|