Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1442 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19245 Week
» 72261 Month
» 191788 Year
» 3218641 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
105 |
m/e |
09/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9105 |
m/e |
10/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
4637 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
64637 |
w/e |
04/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J37 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
To Service |
During 09/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 27/08/1962 off St Margarets (64A) |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1921 |
STM |
|
St Margarets |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
27/08/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/08/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
15/10/1962 |
Inverurie Works |
In shops: 45461, 64595, 65910; waiting: 80093. Awaiting scrapping: 44008, 47168, 47536, 57331/378/613, 65313, 69204. Scrapped five weeks ended 12/10; 57445/671, 64598/607, 64604/30, 64480/637/794. |
SLS/196211 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1921 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 105 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
10/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9105 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4637 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 64637 |
|
|
27/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 64637 from St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
10/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|