Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 157 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17960 Week
» 70976 Month
» 190503 Year
» 3217356 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
163 |
m/e |
03/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3163 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1945) |
3186 |
m/e |
06/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8896 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
68896 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
J50 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
276 |
Works Number |
1422 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1914 to Ardsley (ARD) |
Withdrawal |
Wed 23/08/1961 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 163 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1422 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
10/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3163 |
|
|
06/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3186 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8896 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68896 |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
27/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
20/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
23/08/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68896 |
|
|