Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1906 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19709 Week
» 72725 Month
» 192252 Year
» 3219105 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1207 |
m/e |
10/1897 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4207 |
m/e |
03/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8811 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
68811 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
203 |
Works Number |
741 |
To Service |
During 10/1897 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 27/05/1957 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 7 mths , 27 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
27/05/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1897 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1207 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 741 |
|
|
03/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4207 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8811 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68811 |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
27/05/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68811 |
|
|