Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 127 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17930 Week
» 70946 Month
» 190473 Year
» 3217326 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
971 |
m/e |
08/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3971 |
m/e |
11/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8773 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68773 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
P. Stirling |
Class |
J52 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
657 |
To Service |
During 08/1894 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 13/04/1953 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1894 |
HSY |
|
Hornsey |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
38A |
|
Colwick |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
38A |
|
Colwick |
4w/e |
18/10/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
13/04/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
38A |
Colwick |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
13/04/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 971 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 657 |
|
|
11/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3971 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8773 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68773 |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
13/04/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68773 |
|
|