Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 695 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14101 Week
» 67117 Month
» 186644 Year
» 3213497 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
46 |
m/e |
08/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7046 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8642 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68642 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J68 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
C72 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 08/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 10/09/1961 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 1 mth , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1923 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
08/1937 |
Condensers removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
21/11/1960 |
G.E. Dieselisation |
Extensive dieselisation has taken place on the GE and a considerable re-shuffle of diesels between March, Ipswich and Stratford took place on 21st November. Cambridge has lost all its passenger turns (steam) and its entire allocation of Bls (61046/8/66/71/82, 61236/52/3/4/80/3) has been transferred to March and Norwich, leaving 16 steam engines allocated. South Lynn is now a sub-shed of March, its allocation being 43089/90, 65548/77 an 68499. Lowestoft has lost its 3 steam engines (65462, 65588 and 68642) to store at Trowse and is completely diesel, i.e. D2039, D2553/5/68/70/3. |
SLS/196101 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 46 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
04/1923 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7046 |
|
|
08/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8642 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Parkeston Quay (PKS) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68642 |
|
|
20/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
13/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
07/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68642 |
|
|
10/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|