Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4252 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17658 Week
» 70674 Month
» 190201 Year
» 3217054 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
28 |
m/e |
01/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7028 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8654 |
m/e |
01/1947 |
British Railways |
68654 |
m/e |
10/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J68 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G75 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 11/03/1960 |
Service Life |
46 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
w/e |
04/02/1951 |
ALLOC |
34D |
Hitchin (GNR) |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
14/07/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/03/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1935 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/08/1949 |
Stratford Works |
On 20/8 the Repair Shop contained the following: Nos. 1542, 2501/07/90, 64667/91, 65440, 5551, 8317, 8576, 8654, 9633, 69653, 9685. The last M. & G.N. 'J.93' tank-No. 8489-is in Stratford Yard. Stratford still paints 'British Railways' on tanks and tenders which do not carry the crest. |
SLS/194909 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 28 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7028 |
|
|
03/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
01/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8654 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
04/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
17/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68654 |
|
|
19/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
11/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68654 |
|
|
04/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|