Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 533 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18336 Week
» 71352 Month
» 190879 Year
» 3217732 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
29 |
m/e |
01/1914 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7029 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8655 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
68655 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
J68 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G75 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 01/1914 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 24/11/1959 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 10 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1914 |
BOS |
|
Boston |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
30A |
|
Stratford |
4w/e |
22/08/1953 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
24/11/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/11/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1914 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 29 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7029 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8655 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Boston (BOS) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68655 |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
24/11/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68655 |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|