Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 856 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18659 Week
» 71675 Month
» 191202 Year
» 3218055 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
136 |
m/e |
11/1903 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7136 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8217 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68217 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J70 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
C53 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 11/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 09/03/1953 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1953 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1903 |
KL |
|
Kings Lynn |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31B |
|
March |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
31B |
|
March |
5w/e |
23/08/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
09/03/1953 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/03/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 136 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7136 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8217 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Lynn (KL) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68217 |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/03/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68217 |
|
|