Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1965 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15371 Week
» 68387 Month
» 187914 Year
» 3214767 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
290 |
m/e |
09/1919 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9290 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8349 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
68349 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Reid |
Class |
J88 |
Company History |
NBR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Cowlairs Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1919 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 26/08/1960 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1919 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 290 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9290 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8349 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68349 |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F) |
|
|
26/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68349 |
|
|