Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1388 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19191 Week
» 72207 Month
» 191734 Year
» 3218587 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
75190 |
m/e |
06/1944 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
8023 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
68023 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Riddles |
Class |
J94 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0ST |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Works Number |
7140 |
To Service |
During 06/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/05/1965 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 11 mths , 23 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1949 |
Extended bunker fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/09/1963 |
Thornaby MPD (in store) |
The steam allocation here is now in store viz. 60859/946, 65859/84, 67635/40, 68023/39, 76024, 77001/11/4, 90072/81/406/46/51/593. From 9th September (when West Aukland closed) seven type 3 d/es now work all former West Aukland duties. |
SLS/196310 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1944 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 75190 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7140 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8023 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newport (Teeside) (NPT) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Extended bunker fitted |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 68023 |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
21/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
12/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
24/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 68023 |
|
|