|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1921 | 04/03/1922 | 126 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1923 | 30/06/1923 | 51 days | General | New chimney to G E gauge |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1924 | 05/07/1924 | 143 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4634 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1926 | 19/07/1926 | 120 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/06/1928 | 25/08/1928 | 70 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1931 | 20/06/1931 | 85 days | General | Rebuilt to K2 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/07/1931 | 25/07/1931 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1933 | 06/01/1934 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1936 | 25/04/1936 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1938 | 12/03/1938 | 15 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/09/1939 | 14/10/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1940 | 21/12/1940 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1942 | 09/01/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/11/1944 | 30/12/1944 | 39 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1945 | 10/01/1945 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 05/08/1945 | 08/09/1945 | 35 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/09/1945 | 20/10/1945 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1946 | 30/11/1946 | 36 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/01/1950 | 11/02/1950 | 42 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61724 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/06/1952 | 08/07/1952 | 21 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/10/1952 | 05/11/1952 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/03/1954 | 17/04/1954 | 45 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/05/1954 | 12/05/1954 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/05/1954 | 22/05/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/11/1957 | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61061, 1724, 61909/94, 62411/17/29/55, 2462/69, 62472, 2480, 62485/98, 62675, 2691, 63019/63, 3172, 64527, 4568/74/77, 4922, 5908, 8453, 8952, 68958, 9133, 69150, 9193, 69221, 9518/64, 73777, 77016, 79306, 90313. | SLS/195002 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1913 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1634 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1375 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) |
||
30/10/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/10/1921. Dep: 04/03/1922. | ||
11/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1923. Dep: 30/06/1923. Work undertaken: New chimney to G E gauge |
||
14/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1924. Dep: 05/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4634 |
||
05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
22/06/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
22/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1926. Dep: 19/07/1926. | ||
23/08/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
17/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1928. Dep: 25/08/1928. | ||
10/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
16/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
28/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1931. Dep: 20/06/1931. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to K2 |
||
04/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/07/1931. Dep: 25/07/1931. | ||
02/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1933. Dep: 06/01/1934. | ||
11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
07/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
21/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1936. Dep: 25/04/1936. | ||
26/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 12/03/1938. | ||
02/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1939. Dep: 14/10/1939. | ||
23/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1940. Dep: 21/12/1940. | ||
12/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1942. Dep: 09/01/1943. | ||
04/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
25/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
22/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1944. Dep: 30/12/1944. | ||
1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 10/01/1945. | ||
05/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/08/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945. | ||
20/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945. | ||
26/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1724 | ||
23/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
26/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946. | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
01/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1950. Dep: 11/02/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61724 |
||
18/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 18/06/1952. Dep: 08/07/1952. | ||
01/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/10/1952. Dep: 05/11/1952. | ||
04/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1954. Dep: 17/04/1954. | ||
04/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1954. Dep: 12/05/1954. | ||
20/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1954. Dep: 22/05/1954. | ||
10/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
16/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (No repairs) - Arr: 16/11/1957. | ||
1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
03/01/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61724 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |