|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
24/02/1921 | 22/07/1921 | 149 days | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1924 | 08/11/1924 | 121 days | General | Boiler number 7254 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4643 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1925 | 07/11/1925 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 7607 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1928 | 21/03/1928 | 79 days | General | Boiler number 7266 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1930 | 15/03/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1932 | 05/11/1932 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1934 | 13/10/1934 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1936 | 22/08/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8978 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1938 | 07/05/1938 | 15 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1940 | 13/04/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 21162 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1941 | 02/08/1941 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/06/1942 | 01/08/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1944 | 27/05/1944 | General | Boiler number 21134 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1945 | 03/03/1945 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 24/04/1946 | 08/06/1946 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 21149 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1733 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/07/1948 | 09/09/1948 | 68 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61733 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/04/1949 | 28/05/1949 | 47 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/01/1951 | 16/02/1951 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/02/1951 | 28/02/1951 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/07/1952 | 10/07/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/09/1952 | 04/10/1952 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/06/1953 | 04/07/1953 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 21186 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/05/1955 | 25/06/1955 | 40 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1956 | 02/06/1956 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/11/1956 | 12/01/1957 | 48 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/01/1957 | 29/01/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/01/1957 | 01/02/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1643 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1429 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
11/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1924. Dep: 08/11/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7254 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4643 |
||
22/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1925. Dep: 07/11/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7607 (Diagram 3) |
||
03/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1928. Dep: 21/03/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7266 (Diagram 3) |
||
01/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
01/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1930. Dep: 15/03/1930. | ||
01/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1932. Dep: 05/11/1932. | ||
22/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1934. Dep: 13/10/1934. | ||
25/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1936. Dep: 22/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8978 (Diagram 3) |
||
23/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1938. Dep: 07/05/1938. | ||
23/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1940. Dep: 13/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21162 (Diagram 3) |
||
21/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1941. Dep: 02/08/1941. | ||
27/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1942. Dep: 01/08/1942. | ||
1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21134 (Diagram 3) |
||
1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945. | ||
24/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1946. Dep: 08/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21149 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1733 |
||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
04/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1948. Dep: 09/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61733 |
||
12/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 12/04/1949. Dep: 28/05/1949. | ||
14/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
21/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
23/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/01/1951. Dep: 16/02/1951. | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
23/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1951. Dep: 28/02/1951. | ||
09/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1952. Dep: 10/07/1952. | ||
15/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/09/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952. | ||
15/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1953. Dep: 04/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21186 (Diagram 3) |
||
17/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/05/1955. Dep: 25/06/1955. | ||
24/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/05/1956. Dep: 02/06/1956. | ||
26/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/11/1956. Dep: 12/01/1957. | ||
28/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/01/1957. Dep: 29/01/1957. | ||
30/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/01/1957. Dep: 01/02/1957. | ||
17/10/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61733 from Parkhead (65C) | ||
1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |