|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/03/1921 | 21/09/1921 | 202 days | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1923 | 22/09/1923 | 123 days | General | As 1650N Boiler number 7461 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/07/1925 | 24/10/1925 | 96 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4650 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1927 | 06/01/1928 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 7606 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1928 | 01/03/1928 | 16 days | Light Repair | Altered to GE gauge. Westinghouse brake fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1930 | 12/04/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7457 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1932 | 16/07/1932 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1935 | 16/11/1935 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8860 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1937 | 27/11/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 7838 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1939 | 02/12/1939 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1941 | 20/12/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/01/1944 | 16/02/1944 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 8977 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1944 | 02/12/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/10/1945 | 14/12/1945 | 51 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 09/09/1946 | 27/03/1947 | 200 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/10/1948 | 14/01/1949 | 79 days | General | Boiler number 21142 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61740 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/06/1951 | 13/07/1951 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/07/1951 | 04/08/1951 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/01/1953 | 07/02/1953 | 24 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/02/1955 | 26/03/1955 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 21151 (Diagram 3) Westinghouse Brake removed |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/12/1957 | 11/01/1958 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1961 | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1916 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1650 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1466 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
23/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1923. Dep: 22/09/1923. Work undertaken: As 1650N Boiler number 7461 (Diagram 3) |
||
21/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1925. Dep: 24/10/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4650 |
||
06/12/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
25/04/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
22/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 06/01/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7606 (Diagram 3) |
||
15/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/02/1928. Dep: 01/03/1928. Work undertaken: Altered to GE gauge. Westinghouse brake fitted |
||
07/03/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
04/1928 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted | ||
08/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1930. Dep: 12/04/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7457 (Diagram 3) |
||
26/09/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E) | ||
28/12/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
02/10/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
18/12/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
04/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1932. Dep: 16/07/1932. | ||
12/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1935. Dep: 16/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8860 (Diagram 3) |
||
06/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1937. Dep: 27/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7838 (Diagram 3) |
||
09/05/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
28/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 02/12/1939. | ||
15/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1941. Dep: 20/12/1941. | ||
02/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1944. Dep: 16/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8977 (Diagram 3) |
||
18/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/11/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944. | ||
25/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1945. Dep: 14/12/1945. | ||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1740 | ||
09/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/09/1946. Dep: 27/03/1947. | ||
22/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
17/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
28/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1948. Dep: 14/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21142 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61740 |
||
18/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
22/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
07/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
10/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/06/1951. Dep: 13/07/1951. | ||
19/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/07/1951. Dep: 04/08/1951. | ||
15/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 15/01/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953. | ||
02/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1955. Dep: 26/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21151 (Diagram 3) Westinghouse Brake removed |
||
04/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/12/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958. | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
01/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 01/01/1961. | ||
03/01/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61740 from Colwick (40E) |