|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1922 | 21/10/1922 | 113 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1924 | 20/12/1924 | 84 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4663 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1927 | 12/05/1927 | 92 days | Light Repair | Westinghouse pump only fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1927 | 19/10/1927 | 12 days | Light Repair | Altered to GE gauge. Westinghouse brake completed Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/11/1928 | 19/01/1929 | 73 days | General | Boiler number 7610 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1930 | 29/03/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1932 | 23/04/1932 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 7258 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1934 | 23/06/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21111 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1936 | 04/04/1936 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/12/1937 | 08/01/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 8862 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1939 | 03/06/1939 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9193 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/09/1942 | 10/10/1942 | 29 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/06/1944 | 05/08/1944 | 42 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/05/1945 | 10/07/1945 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 9009 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/09/1946 | 27/10/1946 | 52 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1753 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/03/1947 | 19/07/1947 | 118 days | General | Boiler number 8869 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/09/1947 | 12/10/1947 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1948 | 20/02/1948 | 37 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1753 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/07/1949 | 27/08/1949 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61753 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/07/1951 | 20/09/1951 | 79 days | General | Boiler number 21165 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/02/1954 | 20/03/1954 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | Westinghouse Brake removed |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/04/1955 | 02/06/1955 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 21171 (Diagram 3) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
30/09/1947 | WD | The Italian State Railways have commenced renumbering the W.D. and U.S.A. locomotives they took over in 1946. Three classes have so far had new numbers allocated to them. The W.D. 2-8-2 Nos. 71016/28/37/8/40/83/4/5/7/9/95/7/8/1100/6/9/10/3/4/9/20/46/8/51/7/66/7/89/91/3, are to become 747.001 to 747.030. No. 71027 taken over in 1946 has apparently been withdrawn. The USA. 2-8-0 Nos. 1650/75/93/6, 1711/6/8/32/4/7/40/1/7/52/3/61/5/7/74/5/82, 1783/5/99, 1851/2/7/8/60/5/6/8/70, 2059/60/6/7/8/9/70/8/9/80/1, 2736-50, 2766-75, 3275-8, 3283-3320, 3322-6, 3328/9/32/4/5/6/7/9/42/8/50, 3380-96, 3405-8, 3411-28, 3430, 3562/8/9/70/1/2, 3611/7/8/9/22/3/40/1, 3660-71, 3685-99, 4418/21/37, 5701/2/31/5/6, 5740-58, 5760/1, 5825/9/34, 5835/44/5, are to become 736.001 to 736.243. Of these up to No. 2081 saw previous service in Algeria and Tunisia. The rest were shipped direct from the U.S.A. to Naples. No. 4418 was noted as Alco. 73410 of 1945. U.S.A. 0-6-OT Nos. 1927/9/30/1 are to become 831.001 to 831.004. No. 1928 has been withdrawn or sold. No mention has yet been made of the renumbering of the Stanier 2-8-0, but it seems more than likely that they will become Nos. 737.001 to 737.015. | SLS/194711 |
30/04/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1422/53, 2053, 2230/33, 2414, 2805/10/25, 2915/30/34/35, 3421, 3610, 3709, 3824/48/58, 4017/19/50/89/92/99, 4248/57, 4500/24/50/74/75, 4706, 4906/09/37/63/64, 5037,91/95, 5314, 5900/06124/30/41/60/64/81, 6009/21/26, 6119/24/34/51/62/68, 6313/56/72/98, 6806/63, 6918, 7003, 7321, W.D. 77000, 78607, 79283/288. W.D. No. 77060/145/280/335, 78624 an 79244 have had their tenders removed and were taken to the stock shed on 25/3, where they are now stored. Works' pilots have been: Nos. 198, 1713/53, 2781 an 15102 PDN. New Work 30/4: 15102 PDN (being run in as Works' pilot); 6990; 9662 NPT, 9663 TN, 9664 NPT, 9665, 9666 NEA; 7008 being nearly complete. Engines condemned during April included: Nos. 302 an 3408 | SLS/194806 |
27/08/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. | SLS/194910 |
04/10/1958 | Colwich MPD - stored locomotives | 63729, 63839, 63614, 64976/88, 61739/52/3/4/80, 90005/25/53/288; J50s are going into store as new diesel shunters arrive (D3624/5/6/7 have arrived). | SLS/195811 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1663 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21974 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
01/07/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1922. Dep: 21/10/1922. | ||
1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
28/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1924. Dep: 20/12/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4663 |
||
10/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1927. Dep: 12/05/1927. Work undertaken: Westinghouse pump only fitted |
||
08/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/10/1927. Dep: 19/10/1927. Work undertaken: Altered to GE gauge. Westinghouse brake completed Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
03/11/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
08/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1928. Dep: 19/01/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7610 (Diagram 3) |
||
18/01/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
05/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
17/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
31/12/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
15/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1930. Dep: 29/03/1930. | ||
24/09/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
04/10/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
09/01/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
12/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1932. Dep: 23/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7258 (Diagram 3) |
||
06/08/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
02/10/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
15/01/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
19/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21111 (Diagram 3) |
||
06/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
03/11/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
21/11/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E) | ||
15/12/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
05/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
17/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
14/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1936. Dep: 04/04/1936. | ||
04/10/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
24/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
25/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1937. Dep: 08/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8862 (Diagram 3) |
||
22/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 03/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9193 (Diagram 3) |
||
12/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942. | ||
25/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1944. Dep: 05/08/1944. | ||
22/02/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
23/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1945. Dep: 10/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9009 (Diagram 3) |
||
13/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
06/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1946. Dep: 27/10/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1753 |
||
24/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1947. Dep: 19/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8869 (Diagram 3) |
||
23/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/09/1947. Dep: 12/10/1947. | ||
22/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
15/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/01/1948. Dep: 20/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1753 |
||
21/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/07/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61753 |
||
04/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1951. Dep: 20/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21165 (Diagram 3) |
||
05/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
16/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/02/1954. Dep: 20/03/1954. Work undertaken: Westinghouse Brake removed |
||
25/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 02/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21171 (Diagram 3) |
||
28/09/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61753 from Colwick (40E) | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |