|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1921 | 29/10/1921 | 15 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1923 | 11/08/1923 | 129 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1924 | 14/11/1924 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1926 | 09/10/1926 | 111 days | General | Boiler number 7258 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1927 | 27/08/1927 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1928 | 17/11/1928 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 7452 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/07/1930 | 30/08/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/08/1932 | 01/10/1932 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7549 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1934 | 06/10/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8760 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1936 | 26/09/1936 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1939 | 16/09/1939 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 21158 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/11/1941 | 06/12/1941 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1943 | 18/09/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/03/1945 | 14/04/1945 | 31 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/10/1945 | 29/10/1945 | 25 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 21163 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1947 | 22/02/1947 | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 30/03/1948 | 21/05/1948 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 21161 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61758 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/04/1949 | 10/05/1949 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/02/1950 | 10/03/1950 | 35 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/01/1951 | 31/03/1951 | 70 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/08/1951 | 23/08/1951 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/09/1952 | 11/10/1952 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | New cab side window |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/02/1954 | 27/03/1954 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 21158 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/04/1954 | 26/04/1954 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/05/1956 | 16/06/1956 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | WPU gear removed |
||
16/08/1957 | 05/09/1957 | 21 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1948 | Eastfield MPD | The following 'K.2's' ex Cowlairs Works have been observed here as follows:-No. 61727 IMM (24/4), still with L.N.E.R. on tender; 61738 SL, also still L.N.E.R. (2/5); 61758 CLK (30/5) and 61743 SL (30/5) | SLS/194807 |
28/02/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61002/64, 61350, 61742/43/57/58, 1760, 61792, 61851, 61996/98, 62215, 2431/89, 62719, 4556, 64589, 4597/99, 64613, 4922, 5903, 65926, 67455, 67605, 8956, 69139, 69203/08, 69500/96, ex-W.D. 73789. 90755/66. | SLS/195004 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1668 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21979 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
15/10/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1921. Dep: 29/10/1921. | ||
05/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1923. Dep: 11/08/1923. | ||
13/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/10/1924. Dep: 14/11/1924. | ||
23/03/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4668 | ||
21/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1926. Dep: 09/10/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7258 (Diagram 3) |
||
20/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/07/1927. Dep: 27/08/1927. | ||
04/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1928. Dep: 17/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7452 (Diagram 3) |
||
26/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1930. Dep: 30/08/1930. | ||
27/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1932. Dep: 01/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7549 (Diagram 3) |
||
01/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1934. Dep: 06/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8760 (Diagram 3) |
||
22/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1936. Dep: 26/09/1936. | ||
05/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1939. Dep: 16/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21158 (Diagram 3) |
||
29/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
08/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1941. Dep: 06/12/1941. | ||
04/04/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
14/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943. | ||
15/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945. | ||
05/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1945. Dep: 29/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21163 (Diagram 3) |
||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
16/06/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
27/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1758 | ||
1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: ?/1947. Dep: 22/02/1947. | ||
30/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1948. Dep: 21/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21161 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61758 |
||
23/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/04/1949. Dep: 10/05/1949. | ||
04/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/02/1950. Dep: 10/03/1950. | ||
21/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/01/1951. Dep: 31/03/1951. | ||
01/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
07/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
21/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/08/1951. Dep: 23/08/1951. | ||
17/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) | ||
26/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (62C) | ||
12/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/09/1952. Dep: 11/10/1952. Work undertaken: New cab side window |
||
22/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1954. Dep: 27/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21158 (Diagram 3) |
||
20/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1954. Dep: 26/04/1954. | ||
16/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/05/1956. Dep: 16/06/1956. Work undertaken: WPU gear removed |
||
1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
01/06/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61758 from Dunfermline Upper (62C) |