|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1922 | 30/09/1922 | 86 days | General | Boiler number 7259 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1924 | 27/12/1924 | 102 days | General | Boiler number 7265 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4670 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1926 | 02/10/1926 | 171 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1927 | 01/11/1927 | 79 days | General | Boiler number 7262 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1929 | 04/05/1929 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1930 | 22/11/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7459 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/09/1932 | 15/10/1932 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1934 | 01/12/1934 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1937 | 20/03/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8982 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1939 | 26/08/1939 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21157 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/06/1942 | 01/08/1942 | 36 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/05/1944 | 01/07/1944 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 8756 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/01/1945 | 24/02/1945 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/11/1945 | 12/01/1946 | 59 days | General | Boiler number C1826 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/09/1946 | 28/12/1946 | 93 days | General | Boiler number 21151 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1760 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/02/1947 | 28/03/1947 | 45 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/02/1950 | 21/04/1950 | 62 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61760 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 30/04/1950 | 04/05/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/09/1952 | 25/10/1952 | 27 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/07/1954 | 04/09/1954 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 21107 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/02/1957 | 20/04/1957 | 69 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61002/64, 61350, 61742/43/57/58, 1760, 61792, 61851, 61996/98, 62215, 2431/89, 62719, 4556, 64589, 4597/99, 64613, 4922, 5903, 65926, 67455, 67605, 8956, 69139, 69203/08, 69500/96, ex-W.D. 73789. 90755/66. | SLS/195004 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1670 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21981 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
07/07/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1922. Dep: 30/09/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7259 (Diagram 3) |
||
17/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1924. Dep: 27/12/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7265 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4670 |
||
16/03/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) | ||
15/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1926. Dep: 02/10/1926. | ||
13/06/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
27/07/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
15/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1927. Dep: 01/11/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7262 (Diagram 3) |
||
16/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1929. Dep: 04/05/1929. | ||
18/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1930. Dep: 22/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7459 (Diagram 3) |
||
20/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
10/09/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1932. Dep: 15/10/1932. | ||
28/06/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
31/08/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
27/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1934. Dep: 01/12/1934. | ||
02/07/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
22/01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
27/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1937. Dep: 20/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8982 (Diagram 3) |
||
22/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1939. Dep: 26/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21157 (Diagram 3) |
||
25/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
23/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
27/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1942. Dep: 01/08/1942. | ||
21/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
03/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
23/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8756 (Diagram 3) |
||
14/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945. | ||
15/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1826 (Diagram 3) |
||
16/06/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
27/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1946. Dep: 28/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21151 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1760 |
||
12/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/02/1947. Dep: 28/03/1947. | ||
19/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1950. Dep: 21/04/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61760 |
||
30/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1950. Dep: 04/05/1950. | ||
29/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/09/1952. Dep: 25/10/1952. | ||
12/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21107 (Diagram 3) |
||
10/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
11/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/02/1957. Dep: 20/04/1957. | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
13/12/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61760 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |