|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1922 | 18/11/1922 | 48 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1923 | 01/11/1923 | 235 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1925 | 26/09/1925 | 107 days | General | Boiler number 7466 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4676 |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1926 | 10/04/1926 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1926 | 21/05/1927 | 162 days | General | Altered to GE gauge |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1927 | 15/10/1927 | 8 days | Light Repair | Westinghouse brake jtted Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1929 | 15/06/1929 | 36 days | General | H A at front fitted Boiler number 7465 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1931 | 21/03/1931 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1934 | 24/02/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21110 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1935 | 19/10/1935 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1937 | 24/04/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 21142 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1939 | 17/06/1939 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7837 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1941 | 18/10/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/11/1941 | 27/12/1941 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 01/03/1944 | 07/04/1944 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 21169 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/11/1944 | 23/12/1944 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/03/1946 | 31/05/1946 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 21111 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1948 | 18/02/1948 | 20 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1766 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/05/1949 | 13/08/1949 | 91 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61766 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/04/1950 | 1 day | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 17/11/1952 | 17/01/1953 | 62 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 17/09/1953 | 26/09/1953 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/10/1954 | 27/11/1954 | 39 days | General | Westinghouse brake removed Boiler number 21169 (Diagram 3) Westinghouse Brake removed |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/08/1958 | 30/08/1958 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 21136 (Diagram 3) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Further locos. ex Cowlairs Works that have been noted here during November were: Nos. 1728/45, 1764/6 (green, with 1766 snowplough fitted), 2406/31/64/75, 4574, 4605/39, 4817, 4932, 5924, 7465, 8096, 8471, 8957, 9144/62/73. | SLS/194801 |
31/03/1948 | Stratford Works | The following withdrawn locomotives (all marked 'Darlington') were in the fields behind the new Works: Nos. 5383, 7120/37, 7511/12; with the exception of No. 7137, the rest had gone on 3/4, presumably to Darlington. Nos. 5399, 5410/18, 7130/32 an 8213 (all withdrawn) which were formerly in the fields are now dumped on the road next to the stripping shop. Nos. 7131/35 were being cut up in the Paint Shop. The following W.D. 2-8-0's were newly painted and had been through shops recently:-Nos. 70867/874, 78580, 78605/675, 79205/233. By the type of lettering some appeared to have been dealt with in Belgium. Nos. 1530, 1639, 1766, 4773 an 9652 had been newly painted, prefixed 'E' and lettered 'British Railways,' while those noted renumbered (60000 added) were:-Nos. 1574, 7202, 9639 an 9659. | SLS/194805 |
05/06/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. | SLS/194907 |
27/08/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. | SLS/194910 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1676 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21987 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
02/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/10/1922. Dep: 18/11/1922. | ||
12/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1923. Dep: 01/11/1923. | ||
1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
12/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1925. Dep: 26/09/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7466 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4676 |
||
15/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
23/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
06/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/03/1926. Dep: 10/04/1926. | ||
11/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1926. Dep: 21/05/1927. Work undertaken: Altered to GE gauge |
||
08/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/10/1927. Dep: 15/10/1927. Work undertaken: Westinghouse brake jtted Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
15/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
07/01/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
11/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1929. Dep: 15/06/1929. Work undertaken: H A at front fitted Boiler number 7465 (Diagram 3) |
||
14/06/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
17/09/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
31/12/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
21/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1931. Dep: 21/03/1931. | ||
21/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
09/09/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/10/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E) | ||
26/03/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
20/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1934. Dep: 24/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21110 (Diagram 3) |
||
09/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E) | ||
03/11/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
28/12/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
21/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1935. Dep: 19/10/1935. | ||
04/10/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E) | ||
24/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
10/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1937. Dep: 24/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21142 (Diagram 3) |
||
13/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7837 (Diagram 3) |
||
24/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
13/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1941. Dep: 18/10/1941. | ||
29/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/11/1941. Dep: 27/12/1941. | ||
01/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1944. Dep: 07/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21169 (Diagram 3) |
||
22/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/11/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944. | ||
12/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
22/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1946. Dep: 31/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21111 (Diagram 3) |
||
16/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1766 | ||
30/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/01/1948. Dep: 18/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1766 |
||
04/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to South Lynn (SL) | ||
10/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to South Lynn (SL) | ||
15/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1949. Dep: 13/08/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61766 |
||
29/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/04/1950. | ||
29/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
17/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/11/1952. Dep: 17/01/1953. | ||
25/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
25/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
17/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/09/1953. Dep: 26/09/1953. | ||
20/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1954. Dep: 27/11/1954. Work undertaken: Westinghouse brake removed Boiler number 21169 (Diagram 3) Westinghouse Brake removed |
||
04/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1958. Dep: 30/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21136 (Diagram 3) |
||
01/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
23/01/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61766 from Colwick (40E) |