|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1922 | 01/07/1923 | 209 days | General | Boiler number 7468 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1925 | 20/06/1925 | 94 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4678 |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1925 | 23/01/1926 | 64 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1928 | 20/06/1928 | 146 days | General | Boiler number 7300 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1930 | 17/05/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1931 | 26/12/1931 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/07/1933 | 02/09/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7942 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1935 | 11/05/1935 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1938 | 26/02/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 21150 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1940 | 24/08/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1943 | 20/02/1943 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8861 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/08/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 54 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/03/1947 | 24/10/1947 | 208 days | General | Boiler number 8843 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1948 | 21/08/1948 | 25 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61768 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/04/1950 | 03/06/1950 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 9193 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/11/1950 | 09/12/1950 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/07/1952 | 06/09/1952 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 21116 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/09/1954 | 04/11/1954 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 21167 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/11/1954 | 07/12/1954 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/05/1957 | 29/06/1957 | 56 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/09/1957 | 19/10/1957 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1959 | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Cowlairs Works | On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. | SLS/194710 |
30/10/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. | SLS/194712 |
30/04/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1678 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21989 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
05/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1922. Dep: 01/07/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7468 (Diagram 3) |
||
19/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1925. Dep: 20/06/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4678 |
||
11/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
21/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/11/1925. Dep: 23/01/1926. | ||
01/04/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
27/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1928. Dep: 20/06/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7300 (Diagram 3) |
||
12/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1930. Dep: 17/05/1930. | ||
14/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1931. Dep: 26/12/1931. | ||
29/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1933. Dep: 02/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7942 (Diagram 3) |
||
13/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1935. Dep: 11/05/1935. | ||
25/07/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
05/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E) | ||
11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
17/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
30/01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
05/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
27/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
05/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1938. Dep: 26/02/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21150 (Diagram 3) |
||
09/05/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
25/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
23/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
20/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1940. Dep: 24/08/1940. | ||
03/04/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
16/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8861 (Diagram 3) |
||
15/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. | ||
30/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1768 | ||
31/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1947. Dep: 24/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8843 (Diagram 3) |
||
28/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/07/1948. Dep: 21/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61768 |
||
11/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1950. Dep: 03/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9193 (Diagram 3) |
||
27/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/11/1950. Dep: 09/12/1950. | ||
31/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1952. Dep: 06/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21116 (Diagram 3) |
||
13/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1954. Dep: 04/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21167 (Diagram 3) |
||
25/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/11/1954. Dep: 07/12/1954. | ||
05/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/05/1957. Dep: 29/06/1957. | ||
26/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/09/1957. Dep: 19/10/1957. | ||
1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
22/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/01/1959. | ||
26/01/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61768 from Colwick (40E) |