|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1923 | 19/04/1924 | 137 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4682 |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1926 | 07/08/1926 | 136 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1927 | 11/06/1927 | 72 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1928 | 27/07/1928 | 145 days | General | Boiler number 7251 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1930 | 28/06/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1931 | 29/08/1931 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/09/1931 | 17/10/1931 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1932 | 1 day | Unknown Regime | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1933 | 22/04/1933 | General | Boiler number 7615 (Diagram 3) Named LOCH LOCHY |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1934 | 13/07/1934 | General | Side window cab & drop grate fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1935 | 12/07/1935 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1937 | 23/01/1937 | General | Boiler number C1826 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1937 | 11/1937 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 20/05/1938 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 24/06/1938 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 07/07/1939 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 12/1939 | 10/01/1940 | General | Boiler number 7616 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1940 | 27/03/1940 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1941 | 07/02/1941 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 25/04/1942 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 23/10/1943 | 04/12/1943 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9072 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1945 | 13/02/1945 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 07/05/1946 | 08/06/1946 | 33 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1947 | 09/05/1947 | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 30/01/1948 | 27/02/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 21123 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 31/03/1948 | 01/04/1948 | 2 days | Unclassified | Renumbered to BR 61772 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/06/1949 | 02/07/1949 | 27 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/01/1951 | 02/02/1951 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/05/1952 | 12/06/1952 | 43 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/11/1953 | 12/12/1953 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 21126 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 26/07/1954 | 07/08/1954 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/11/1955 | 03/12/1955 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/12/1955 | 17/12/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/08/1957 | 28/09/1957 | 34 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. | SLS/194908 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1682 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5332 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
05/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1923. Dep: 19/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4682 |
||
25/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1926. Dep: 07/08/1926. | ||
01/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1927. Dep: 11/06/1927. | ||
05/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1928. Dep: 27/07/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7251 (Diagram 3) |
||
24/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1930. Dep: 28/06/1930. | ||
25/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931. | ||
05/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/09/1931. Dep: 17/10/1931. | ||
29/10/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: ?/1932. | ||
1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1933. Dep: 22/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7615 (Diagram 3) Named LOCH LOCHY |
||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: 13/07/1934. Work undertaken: Side window cab & drop grate fitted |
||
1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1935. Dep: 12/07/1935. | ||
1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: 23/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1826 (Diagram 3) |
||
1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: ?/11/1937. | ||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 20/05/1938. | ||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 24/06/1938. | ||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 07/07/1939. | ||
01/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/12/1939. Dep: 10/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7616 (Diagram 3) |
||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: 27/03/1940. | ||
1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1941. Dep: 07/02/1941. | ||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: 25/04/1942. | ||
07/09/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
23/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1943. Dep: 04/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9072 (Diagram 3) |
||
1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 13/02/1945. | ||
07/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1946. Dep: 08/06/1946. | ||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1772 | ||
1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1947. Dep: 09/05/1947. | ||
30/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1948. Dep: 27/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21123 (Diagram 3) |
||
31/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1948. Dep: 01/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61772 |
||
06/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 06/06/1949. Dep: 02/07/1949. | ||
20/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (PKD) | ||
01/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/01/1951. Dep: 02/02/1951. | ||
01/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 01/05/1952. Dep: 12/06/1952. | ||
18/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1953. Dep: 12/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21126 (Diagram 3) |
||
26/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/07/1954. Dep: 07/08/1954. | ||
08/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/11/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955. | ||
14/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/12/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955. | ||
26/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1957. Dep: 28/09/1957. | ||
25/11/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61772 from Parkhead (65C) | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |