|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1923 | 19/04/1924 | 144 days | General | Boiler number 7464 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4684 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1926 | 03/07/1926 | 111 days | General | Boiler number 7838 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/11/1928 | 03/01/1929 | 49 days | General | Altered to GE gauge |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1929 | 28/09/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1931 | 24/10/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 7470 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1933 | 01/01/1933 | Unknown Regime | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1934 | 02/11/1934 | General | Side window cab & drop grate fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 03/1936 | 22/04/1936 | General | Boiler number 7455 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1937 | 19/08/1937 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 13/10/1938 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 14/10/1939 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 11/1939 | Light Repair | Cab screens fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1940 | 15/08/1940 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1940 | 30/11/1940 | General | Hudd A.T.C. fitted Boiler number C1828 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1941 | 14/06/1941 | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 21117 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1941 | 03/09/1941 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 11/07/1942 | Light Repair | Hudd removed |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 04/07/1942 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1943 | 08/03/1943 | Heavy | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1943 | 21/12/1943 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1945 | 10/03/1945 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1945 | 23/11/1945 | Unknown Regime | Snow plough fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 07/09/1945 | 10/10/1945 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 8562 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1946 | 06/04/1946 | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 21188 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 09/04/1947 | 08/05/1947 | 30 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1948 | 26/06/1948 | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61774 |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 17/02/1949 | 20/08/1949 | 185 days | General | Boiler number 21106 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 30/01/1951 | 03/03/1951 | 33 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/06/1952 | 18/07/1952 | 25 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/06/1954 | 14/08/1954 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 21174 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/05/1955 | 09/07/1955 | 48 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/01/1956 | 11/02/1956 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/08/1956 | 15/09/1956 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/11/1956 | 19/01/1957 | 53 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/03/1957 | 16/03/1957 | 11 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1684 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5334 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
28/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1923. Dep: 19/04/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7464 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4684 |
||
15/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1926. Dep: 03/07/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7838 (Diagram 3) |
||
16/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1928. Dep: 03/01/1929. Work undertaken: Altered to GE gauge |
||
24/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1929. Dep: 28/09/1929. | ||
03/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1931. Dep: 24/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7470 (Diagram 3) |
||
17/11/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: ?/1933. Dep: 01/01/1933. | ||
07/1933 | Naming | Named 'LOCH GARRY' | ||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: 02/11/1934. Work undertaken: Side window cab & drop grate fitted |
||
03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/03/1936. Dep: 22/04/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7455 (Diagram 3) |
||
1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: 19/08/1937. | ||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 13/10/1938. | ||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 14/10/1939. | ||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: ?/11/1939. Work undertaken: Cab screens fitted |
||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940. Work undertaken: Hudd A.T.C. fitted Boiler number C1828 (Diagram 3) |
||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: 15/08/1940. | ||
02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: ?/1941. Dep: 14/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21117 (Diagram 3) |
||
1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1941. Dep: 03/09/1941. | ||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: 04/07/1942. | ||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: 11/07/1942. Work undertaken: Hudd removed |
||
09/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 08/03/1943. | ||
1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 21/12/1943. | ||
1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945. | ||
1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 23/11/1945. Work undertaken: Snow plough fitted |
||
07/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1945. Dep: 10/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8562 (Diagram 3) |
||
1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21188 (Diagram 3) |
||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1774 | ||
09/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/04/1947. Dep: 08/05/1947. | ||
1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1948. Dep: 26/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61774 |
||
17/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1949. Dep: 20/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21106 (Diagram 3) |
||
30/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/01/1951. Dep: 03/03/1951. | ||
24/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 24/06/1952. Dep: 18/07/1952. | ||
10/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1954. Dep: 14/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21174 (Diagram 3) |
||
23/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/05/1955. Dep: 09/07/1955. | ||
07/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/01/1956. Dep: 11/02/1956. | ||
27/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/08/1956. Dep: 15/09/1956. | ||
28/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/11/1956. Dep: 19/01/1957. | ||
06/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/03/1957. Dep: 16/03/1957. | ||
1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
16/04/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61774 from Eastfield (65A) |