|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1921 | 13/07/1921 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1922 | 25/05/1922 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1923 | 03/03/1923 | 55 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1924 | 21/06/1924 | 167 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4689 |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1926 | 18/04/1926 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1928 | 13/04/1928 | 86 days | General | Boiler number 7547 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1929 | 12/11/1929 | 25 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/08/1931 | 19/09/1931 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1931 | 26/12/1931 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1933 | 03/06/1933 | Unknown Regime | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1934 | 06/10/1934 | General | Side window cab fitted Boiler number 7620 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1934 | 16/10/1934 | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1935 | 23/03/1935 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1936 | 23/04/1936 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1937 | 08/07/1937 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 25/08/1938 | General | Cab screens fitted Boiler number 7254 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 23/12/1939 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1941 | 31/05/1941 | General | Hudd A.T.C. fitted Boiler number 9154 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 14/11/1942 | General | Hudd removed |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1943 | 05/05/1943 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 07/08/1944 | 23/09/1944 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 21148 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 28/06/1946 | 26/07/1946 | 29 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1948 | 30/04/1948 | 98 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61779 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/10/1949 | 19/11/1949 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/05/1951 | 31/05/1951 | 21 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/09/1951 | 20/10/1951 | 23 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/11/1952 | 27/12/1952 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 21156 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/10/1954 | 13/11/1954 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/11/1954 | 27/11/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/05/1957 | 22/06/1957 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 21179 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/06/1957 | 29/06/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/10/1958 | 14/11/1958 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/03/1959 | 18/03/1959 | 15 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61219, 61779/81, 61855, 1900, 62432/78, 2484, 3071, 3134/47/75/84, 4565, 64578, 4639, 4711/92, 4816, 64849, 4927, 65929/31, 7484/95, 8332/48, 68456, 69130, 9165, 69199, 9216, 69514, 9562, 77119, 79265. | SLS/194912 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1689 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5339 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
08/07/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/07/1921. Dep: 13/07/1921. | ||
01/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/05/1922. Dep: 25/05/1922. | ||
08/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/01/1923. Dep: 03/03/1923. | ||
07/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1924. Dep: 21/06/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4689 |
||
01/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1926. Dep: 18/04/1926. | ||
10/05/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
19/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1928. Dep: 13/04/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7547 (Diagram 3) |
||
13/04/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
19/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1929. Dep: 12/11/1929. | ||
03/12/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
01/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1931. Dep: 19/09/1931. | ||
24/09/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
28/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/11/1931. Dep: 26/12/1931. | ||
07/01/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: ?/1933. Dep: 03/06/1933. | ||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: 06/10/1934. Work undertaken: Side window cab fitted Boiler number 7620 (Diagram 3) |
||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: 16/10/1934. | ||
1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1935. Dep: 23/03/1935. | ||
1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1936. Dep: 23/04/1936. | ||
1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: 08/07/1937. | ||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 25/08/1938. Work undertaken: Cab screens fitted Boiler number 7254 (Diagram 3) |
||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 23/12/1939. | ||
1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1941. Dep: 31/05/1941. Work undertaken: Hudd A.T.C. fitted Boiler number 9154 (Diagram 3) |
||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: 14/11/1942. Work undertaken: Hudd removed |
||
1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 05/05/1943. | ||
24/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
07/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21148 (Diagram 3) |
||
27/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1779 | ||
28/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/06/1946. Dep: 26/07/1946. | ||
24/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1948. Dep: 30/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61779 |
||
20/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/10/1949. Dep: 19/11/1949. | ||
11/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/05/1951. Dep: 31/05/1951. | ||
28/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/09/1951. Dep: 20/10/1951. | ||
05/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) | ||
04/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1952. Dep: 27/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21156 (Diagram 3) |
||
07/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keith (61C) | ||
09/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/10/1954. Dep: 13/11/1954. | ||
25/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/11/1954. Dep: 27/11/1954. | ||
20/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1957. Dep: 22/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21179 (Diagram 3) |
||
27/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/06/1957. Dep: 29/06/1957. | ||
21/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/10/1958. Dep: 14/11/1958. | ||
04/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1959. Dep: 18/03/1959. | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
13/05/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61779 from Keith (61C) |