|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1922 | 25/03/1922 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1922 | 16/12/1922 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1923 | 20/10/1923 | 73 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1925 | 18/04/1925 | 59 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4693 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/06/1925 | 20/06/1925 | 11 days | Light Repair | Altered to NB gauge |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1931 | 13/06/1931 | General | Boiler number 7613 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1933 | 07/04/1933 | General | Boiler number 7254 (Diagram 3) Named LOCH SHEIL |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1934 | 10/09/1934 | Heavy | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1934 | 04/12/1934 | General | Side window cab & drop grate fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1936 | 07/09/1936 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 02/1938 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 01/03/1938 | General | Boiler number 9072 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 25/03/1938 | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 07/10/1939 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1940 | 22/03/1940 | Light Repair | Cab side screens fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1941 | 03/09/1941 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1941 | 16/08/1941 | General | Hudd A.T.C. fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1941 | 18/01/1941 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1943 | 16/10/1943 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 11/09/1943 | 02/10/1943 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 7613 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/09/1945 | 10/10/1945 | 35 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/02/1947 | 18/04/1947 | 69 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/04/1948 | 10/04/1948 | 9 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61783 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/05/1948 | 19/06/1948 | 41 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1949 | 01/1949 | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 29/07/1949 | 27/08/1949 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1951 | 01/1951 | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 21176 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 24/09/1951 | 20/10/1951 | 27 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/12/1954 | 29/01/1955 | 43 days | General | WRU gear removed Boiler number 21116 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/04/1955 | 19/04/1955 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/02/1957 | 09/03/1957 | 27 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/03/1957 | 20/03/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/04/1957 | 03/04/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (Paint Shop) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
27/08/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. | SLS/194910 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1693 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5343 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
08/03/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1922. Dep: 25/03/1922. | ||
28/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/11/1922. Dep: 16/12/1922. | ||
09/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1923. Dep: 20/10/1923. | ||
19/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1925. Dep: 18/04/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4693 |
||
10/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/06/1925. Dep: 20/06/1925. Work undertaken: Altered to NB gauge |
||
07/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1931. Dep: 13/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7613 (Diagram 3) |
||
1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1933. Dep: 07/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7254 (Diagram 3) Named LOCH SHEIL |
||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: 04/12/1934. Work undertaken: Side window cab & drop grate fitted |
||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: 10/09/1934. | ||
1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1936. Dep: 07/09/1936. | ||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 01/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9072 (Diagram 3) |
||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: ?/02/1938. | ||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 25/03/1938. | ||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 07/10/1939. | ||
07/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Fort William (FW) | ||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: 22/03/1940. Work undertaken: Cab side screens fitted |
||
1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1941. Dep: 16/08/1941. Work undertaken: Hudd A.T.C. fitted |
||
1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1941. Dep: 03/09/1941. | ||
1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1941. Dep: 18/01/1941. | ||
1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 16/10/1943. | ||
11/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1943. Dep: 02/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7613 (Diagram 3) |
||
06/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1945. Dep: 10/10/1945. | ||
27/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1783 | ||
09/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/02/1947. Dep: 18/04/1947. | ||
02/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/04/1948. Dep: 10/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61783 |
||
10/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/05/1948. Dep: 19/06/1948. | ||
1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: ?/1949. Dep: ?/01/1949. | ||
29/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/07/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949. | ||
1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: ?/1951. Dep: ?/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21176 (Diagram 3) |
||
24/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 24/09/1951. Dep: 20/10/1951. | ||
27/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
06/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Fort William (63D) | ||
06/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) | ||
18/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1954. Dep: 29/01/1955. Work undertaken: WRU gear removed Boiler number 21116 (Diagram 3) |
||
06/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/04/1955. Dep: 19/04/1955. | ||
03/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keith (61C) | ||
11/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/02/1957. Dep: 09/03/1957. | ||
18/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/03/1957. Dep: 20/03/1957. | ||
01/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/04/1957. Dep: 03/04/1957. | ||
1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
17/06/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61783 from Keith (61C) |