|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1924 | 10/05/1924 | 121 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4697 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1925 | 18/03/1925 | 56 days | Light Repair | Altered to NB gauge |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1932 | 27/02/1932 | General | Boiler number 7621 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1933 | 17/06/1933 | General | Boiler number 7613 (Diagram 3) Named LOCH QUOICH |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1934 | 27/11/1934 | General | Side window cab fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1936 | 15/02/1936 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 15/05/1937 | 15/06/1937 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 21128 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 17/09/1938 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 15/04/1939 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 09/12/1939 | General | Cab screens fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 02/08/1941 | 30/08/1941 | 29 days | General | Hudd A.T.C. fitted Boiler number 7619 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1943 | 25/07/1943 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1943 | 11/12/1943 | Heavy | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1945 | 18/07/1945 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 08/02/1946 | 16/03/1946 | 37 days | Heavy | Boiler number 9350 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1947 | 03/05/1947 | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 05/11/1947 | 24/01/1948 | 81 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1948 | 19/06/1948 | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61787 |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 20/06/1949 | 15/08/1949 | 57 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/08/1949 | 24/09/1949 | 25 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/03/1951 | 02/06/1951 | 89 days | General | Boiler number 21104 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/06/1951 | 29/06/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/12/1951 | 28/02/1952 | 74 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/06/1953 | 20/06/1953 | 18 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/01/1956 | 03/03/1956 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 21134 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/02/1958 | 08/03/1958 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Cowlairs Works | No engines have as yet (7/2) appeared from Cowlairs Works lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' or painted in any new style; the same remarks also apply to Q.P. Works. Further locomotives ex Cowlairs Works painted green are: Nos. 1787-89, 2679/80, while Nos. 2440/2, 9189, an 9215 were just ex Works, the latter having acquired the vacuum brake | SLS/194803 |
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (Steaming Pits) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
01/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. | SLS/194911 |
12/06/1954 | Scottish Miscellany | On 12th June, No. 57460 was working the Killin branch. The following day, the 13th, L.M.S. Class 5's were well in evidence at Fort William; engines on the shed were Nos. 44968, 45245, 45367, 61787, 62011, 62031, 61994/5. Nos. 44928 an 44991 arrived on an eight-coach train. Opinion of the Stanier Blacks was that they were good engines, but spoilt by the injectors, which have been giving a considerable amount of trouble. On 26th June No. 40151 was noted at Aviemore, a N.B.R. 4-4-0 (Glen?) passed Newtonmore in the down direction with a twelve-wheeled coach. No. 42130 was banking from Blair Atholl, while No. 77008 was on the shed. No B.R. Class 5 engines were seen, all trains being handled by Staniers, either singly or in pairs. 54398 'Ben Alder' is still lying at the back of Lochgorm Works. | SLS/195408 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1697 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5347 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
11/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1924. Dep: 10/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4697 |
||
22/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1925. Dep: 18/03/1925. Work undertaken: Altered to NB gauge |
||
01/04/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1932. Dep: 27/02/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7621 (Diagram 3) |
||
1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1933. Dep: 17/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7613 (Diagram 3) Named LOCH QUOICH |
||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: 27/11/1934. Work undertaken: Side window cab fitted |
||
1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1936. Dep: 15/02/1936. | ||
15/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1937. Dep: 15/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21128 (Diagram 3) |
||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 17/09/1938. | ||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939. Work undertaken: Cab screens fitted |
||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 15/04/1939. | ||
07/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Fort William (FW) | ||
02/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1941. Dep: 30/08/1941. Work undertaken: Hudd A.T.C. fitted Boiler number 7619 (Diagram 3) |
||
1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 11/12/1943. | ||
1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 25/07/1943. | ||
1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 18/07/1945. | ||
13/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1787 | ||
08/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/02/1946. Dep: 16/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9350 (Diagram 3) |
||
1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1947. Dep: 03/05/1947. | ||
05/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1947. Dep: 24/01/1948. | ||
1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: ?/1948. Dep: 19/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61787 |
||
20/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/06/1949. Dep: 15/08/1949. | ||
31/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 31/08/1949. Dep: 24/09/1949. | ||
06/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1951. Dep: 02/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21104 (Diagram 3) |
||
27/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/06/1951. Dep: 29/06/1951. | ||
17/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/12/1951. Dep: 28/02/1952. | ||
03/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 03/06/1953. Dep: 20/06/1953. | ||
24/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1956. Dep: 03/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21134 (Diagram 3) |
||
09/04/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
04/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/02/1958. Dep: 08/03/1958. | ||
29/10/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61787 from Eastfield (65A) | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |