|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1924 | 08/11/1924 | 121 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4701 |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1925 | 04/03/1925 | 34 days | Light Repair | Altered to NB gauge |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/03/1929 | 23/03/1929 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 7624 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1933 | 06/05/1933 | Unknown Regime | Named LOCH LAGGAN |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1934 | 02/1934 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 11/08/1934 | 13/09/1934 | 34 days | General | Side window cab fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1935 | 25/08/1935 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1936 | 01/1936 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1937 | 09/07/1937 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 24/06/1938 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 29/09/1938 | General | Cab screens fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1940 | 02/03/1940 | General | Boiler number 8977 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 23/02/1942 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 06/03/1942 | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 24/11/1942 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1943 | 28/06/1943 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1944 | 22/01/1944 | General | Boiler number 21114 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1944 | 11/12/1944 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1944 | 09/02/1944 | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 11/05/1945 | 06/06/1945 | 27 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1946 | 27/12/1946 | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1791 |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 02/08/1947 | 03/10/1947 | 63 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1948 | 20/11/1948 | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61791 |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 12/08/1949 | 15/10/1949 | 65 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/12/1951 | 05/01/1952 | 27 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1952 | 09/1952 | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 07/04/1954 | 10/06/1954 | 65 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/07/1954 | 06/07/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/11/1956 | 15/12/1956 | 33 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/12/1956 | 20/12/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/12/1956 | 03/01/1957 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/05/1958 | 16/05/1958 | 10 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
24/08/1947 | Cowlairs Works | On 24/8 the following withdrawn locos. were in the Works yard: 'Dl' 2212, 'D29' 2415 and 'D31' 2068, the last two having been stripped; whilst those seen here newly painted were: 'D29' 2411 (green), 'J37' 4617 and 'J39' 4704. Locos. awaiting works, some of which had been stripped were: 'J39' 4711, 4817/40/49/65, 4919/22/28/42; 'K2' 1732/46/51/68/91; 'K3' 1879; 'D1' 2216; 'Dll' 2691; 'J38' 5909; 'J36' 5223/61; 'J35' 4503; 'J37' 4546/48/65/67, 4607/15; 'D31' 2059; 'D34' 2489; 'C15' 7453/65/66, 'N14' 9121; 'N15' 9191, 9214. The Erecting Shop was full and included: 'K2' 1720/34/52; 'K3' 1855; 'J39' 4912/16; 'J38' 5901/12; 'Dll' 2684/87 and 'Y9' 8120/22. | SLS/194710 |
30/10/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during October were: Nos. 1743/46/51/68, *1791 (green), 1879, 2432/62/73/95, 2685/91 (both green), 4526/65/67/98, 4607, 4703/04, 4852, 4926/28/42, 5345, 7461/69/97, *8474 (green), 9147/91 an 9205; whilst those observed on 2/11 were *1995 (green), 4608, 4938 an 9500 . Nos. 1701, 1996 an 1998 were observed here fitted with snow-ploughs. Nos. 2479, 4474 an 4633 have been supplying steam to the canteen here during the period approximately from 15/10 to 26/10, while No. 5308 is again in use as a stationary boiler, after having been temporarily replaced by No. 5339. | SLS/194712 |
27/08/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. | SLS/194910 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1701 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5351 Allocated to New England (NWE) |
||
11/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1924. Dep: 08/11/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4701 |
||
30/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/01/1925. Dep: 04/03/1925. Work undertaken: Altered to NB gauge |
||
12/03/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
09/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1929. Dep: 23/03/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7624 (Diagram 3) |
||
1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: ?/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933. Work undertaken: Named LOCH LAGGAN |
||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: ?/02/1934. | ||
11/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1934. Dep: 13/09/1934. Work undertaken: Side window cab fitted |
||
1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1935. Dep: 25/08/1935. | ||
1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1936. Dep: ?/01/1936. | ||
1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: 09/07/1937. | ||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 29/09/1938. Work undertaken: Cab screens fitted |
||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 24/06/1938. | ||
07/01/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8977 (Diagram 3) |
||
07/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
07/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Fort William (FW) | ||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: 23/02/1942. | ||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: 24/11/1942. | ||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: 06/03/1942. | ||
1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 28/06/1943. | ||
1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1944. Dep: 22/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21114 (Diagram 3) |
||
1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1944. Dep: 11/12/1944. | ||
1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1944. Dep: 09/02/1944. | ||
11/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 11/05/1945. Dep: 06/06/1945. | ||
1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: 27/12/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1791 |
||
02/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/08/1947. Dep: 03/10/1947. | ||
1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: ?/1948. Dep: 20/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61791 |
||
12/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1949. Dep: 15/10/1949. | ||
10/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/12/1951. Dep: 05/01/1952. | ||
1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: ?/1952. Dep: ?/09/1952. | ||
27/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
06/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Fort William (63D) | ||
07/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1954. Dep: 10/06/1954. | ||
05/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1954. Dep: 06/07/1954. | ||
13/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 13/11/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956. | ||
18/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/12/1956. Dep: 20/12/1956. | ||
25/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/12/1956. Dep: 03/01/1957. | ||
07/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1958. Dep: 16/05/1958. | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
22/03/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61791 from Fort William (65J) |