Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2800 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16206 Week
» 69222 Month
» 188749 Year
» 3215602 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1392 |
m/e |
11/1929 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1884 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61884 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
316 |
Works Number |
1725 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 11/1929 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Mon 23/07/1962 |
Service Life |
32 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1931 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
11/1931 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1929 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1392 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1725 |
|
|
11/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1884 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
16/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61884 |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
10/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
21/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
05/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
23/07/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61884 |
|
|