Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1613 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 20524 Week
» 85478 Month
» 288142 Year
» 3314995 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2443 |
m/e |
09/1935 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1947 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
61947 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L890 |
Works Number |
24233 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 01/08/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1950 |
Doncaster Works |
Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 60020/43/54, 60133/41, 60512/39, 60820/65/67, 61083, 61634, 61822/24/61, 61947/85, 67713/24, 69444, 69505. A considerable number of 'Pacific' and 'V.2' Class locomotives are being fitted with A.T.C. gear, as part of the ex-G.N. main line has already been equipped with A.T.C. apparatus; this may be extended. |
SLS/195005 |
30/04/1950 |
Doncaster Works |
Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. |
SLS/195006 |
20/08/1954 |
York Area |
New BR Standard Class 5 4-6-0s 73053/54 (20A) joined 73045 at the end of June on the Holbeck working to York and Scarborough., During the Bank Holiday period. Horwich Moguls 42795/98 (20A) were also used on this turn, but it was worked on Saturday 7/8/54 by Jubilee 45605 (20A). Standard Diesel shunter 13127 from Darlington Works arrived at York on 21/7/54 hauled by Diesel 12115, which was returning from Darlington Works to Hull. 13127 proceeded to New England later in the day. The Class Y8 shed pilot at York (formerly 8091) has been renumbered Departmental 55. Class B17 61660 (30A) was working on passenger trains between York and Doncaster from 22/7/54 until 24/7/54. York-Scarborough line LMR Stanier Class 5 4-6-0s working on through duties to Scarborough in July and August have included 44660 (21A), 44830 (19B), 44928 (25A), 44986 (19B), 45237 (25B)-on an excursion from Burton-on-Trent-45259 (10C), 45261 (25A), and 45336 (26A); also Standard 4-6-0 73016 (19B). Class 4F 0-4-0 43963 (21A) also worked through from King's Norton to Scarborough on 24/7/54. K3 61889 (31B) worked the up Scarborough Flyer between Scarborough and York on 7/8/54 and on the same day 61947 (31B) worked the 4.45 p:m. from York to Scarborough. On 24/7/54 the 2.12 p.m. from Scarborough to Kings Cross was worked to York by K3 61980 (38B). An unusual B1 at Scarborough on 25/7/54 was 61331 (34A) on an excursion from Penistone. |
SLS/195410 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2443 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24233 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1947 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61947 |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
01/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61947 |
|
|