Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1543 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14949 Week
» 67965 Month
» 187492 Year
» 3214345 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2450 |
m/e |
10/1935 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1951 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
British Railways |
61951 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L890 |
Works Number |
24237 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 10/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 04/11/1962 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
30F |
Parkeston Quay |
4w/e |
28/03/1958 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
5w/e |
31/12/1960 |
ALLOC |
36A |
Doncaster |
4w/e |
02/09/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/11/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2450 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24237 |
|
|
24/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1951 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61951 |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
17/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
19/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
04/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61951 |
|
|
1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|