Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 697 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19608 Week
» 84562 Month
» 287226 Year
» 3314079 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
67770 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
E. Thompson |
Class |
L1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
E177 |
Works Number |
7504 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 11/1949 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
13 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 67770 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7504 |
|
|
19/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
23/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
14/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67770 |
|
|