Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 322 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18125 Week
» 71141 Month
» 190668 Year
» 3217521 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
67779 |
on |
01/02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
E. Thompson |
Class |
L1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
E177 |
Works Number |
7513 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
Sat 01/02/1950 to Neasden (34E) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
34E |
Neasden |
on |
13/02/1950 |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
6w/e |
09/06/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
29/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/02/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 67779 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7513 Allocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
12/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67779 |
|
|