Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1898 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15304 Week
» 68320 Month
» 187847 Year
» 3214700 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
67797 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
E. Thompson |
Class |
L1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
E177 |
Works Number |
7531 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 08/1950 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 17/10/1962 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1950 |
34E |
|
Neasden |
5w/e |
23/04/1955 |
34A |
|
Kings Cross |
5w/e |
18/06/1955 |
40E |
|
Colwick |
w/e |
12/05/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/10/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
34A |
Kings Cross |
on |
24/08/1950 |
ALLOC |
34E |
Neasden |
4w/e |
23/04/1955 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
6w/e |
09/06/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 67797 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7531 |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
18/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
12/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
17/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67797 |
|
|