Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 165 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17968 Week
» 70984 Month
» 190511 Year
» 3217364 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
67798 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
E. Thompson |
Class |
L1 |
Company History |
LNER |
Wheels |
2-6-4T |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
E177 |
Works Number |
7532 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 08/1950 to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
12 yrs, 4 mths , 28 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
29/01/1961 |
New England (In store) |
60506/8 were in steam on SLS Visit on 29/1/61- 60504 was withdrawn 17/1/61. K2 61742 (from Boston) has replaced 61763 as stationary boiler. In store are L1s 67717/8/21/32/8 for LMR Gorton, and 67778/95/6/8 ex LMR Gorton. |
SLS/196103 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 67798 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 7532 Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
21/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (39A) |
|
|
19/06/1957 |
Report |
Report: On June 19 "L1" 2-6-4 tanks Nos. 67751/81/98 were at work into and out of London Road, Manchester. Together with the newly introduced multiple-unit diesel services, they appeared to have ousted Gorton’s "C14" and "A5" tanks from local passenger jobs. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
11/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (34F) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67798 |
|
|