Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1356 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14762 Week
» 67778 Month
» 187305 Year
» 3214158 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1614 |
m/e |
08/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4614 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9498 |
on |
03/02/1946 |
British Railways |
69498 |
m/e |
01/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
292 |
Works Number |
1530 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 08/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 11/09/1961 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 1 mth , 11 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
08/1921 |
KX |
|
Kings Cross |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
34B |
|
Hornsey |
w/e |
01/10/1960 |
34E |
|
New England |
w/e |
15/07/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
11/09/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
01/10/1960 |
ALLOC |
34E |
New England |
4w/e |
05/08/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/09/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1948 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1614 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1530 |
|
|
04/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4614 |
|
|
03/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9498 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
02/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
01/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69498 |
|
|
01/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
11/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69498 |
|
|