Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2269 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 20072 Week
» 73088 Month
» 192615 Year
» 3219468 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1725 |
m/e |
12/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4725 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9504 |
on |
23/03/1946 |
British Railways |
69504 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L734 |
Works Number |
22581 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 12/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 23/09/1962 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 9 mths , 24 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1927 |
Condensers removed |
09/1931 |
Condenser fitted |
02/1948 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1725 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22581 |
|
|
02/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4725 |
|
|
10/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
09/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Condenser fitted |
|
|
23/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9504 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
02/1948 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (HAT) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69504 |
|
|
25/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
24/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
20/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
22/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
21/08/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
08/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
23/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69504 |
|
|