10/03/1963 |
Doncaster Works (Scrap Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. |
SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 |
Worcester Works (Scrap Yard) |
4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. |
SLS/196304 |
10/03/1963 |
Goole MPD (Stored in Works Yards) |
Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. |
SLS/196304 |
23/04/1963 |
Doncaster Works (Stored in Works Yards) |
New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. |
SLS/196304 |
21/08/1963 |
Doncaster Works (Yard) |
New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. |
SLS/196309 |