Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3668 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13242 Week
» 78196 Month
» 280860 Year
» 3307713 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
896 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9566 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
69566 |
m/e |
02/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
305 |
Works Number |
1629 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 12/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/06/1957 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1938 |
Vacuum |
03/1945 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1949 |
Doncaster Works |
Locomotives noted in Works during April included Nos. 13, 17, 60033/34, 56, 69, 91, 60527, 802/07/96, 911/28/34/54, while those ex the Paint Shop included Nos. 60004/10/27/28/55 an 60100. As yet there is not any sign of either the new blue or green paint being used. |
SLS/194906 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 896 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1629 |
|
|
04/1938 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum |
|
|
03/1945 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9566 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
02/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69566 |
|
|
25/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
17/06/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69566 |
|
|