Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1083 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14489 Week
» 67505 Month
» 187032 Year
» 3213885 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
992E |
m/e |
12/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7992 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9614 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
69614 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
K89 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 12/1923 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 04/12/1960 |
Service Life |
37 yrs , 4 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
w/e |
25/08/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/12/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
05/1936 |
Condensers removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1923 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 992 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7992 |
|
|
05/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9614 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69614 |
|
|
16/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) |
|
|
25/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
04/12/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69614 |
|
|