Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1823 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19626 Week
» 72642 Month
» 192169 Year
» 3219022 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9227 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9224 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
69224 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/01/1963 |
Inverurie Works (Scrapped) |
Shopped: 42262/9, D361, D6142 an 61397. Scrapped: 69135/50, 69224. Being Scrapped: 65334, 68101. In Shops: 64592/7, D261/3. |
SLS/196302 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1924 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 9227 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9224 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69224 |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) |
|
|
12/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (61C) |
|
|
11/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
01/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
01/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69224 from St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
02/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|