|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 14/06/1923 | 07/11/1923 | 147 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 483N |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/12/1925 | 26/03/1926 | 99 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/02/1928 | 18/05/1928 | 80 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1930 | 08/02/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7236 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/03/1932 | 23/04/1932 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/06/1934 | 14/07/1934 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1936 | 08/08/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 8973 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1938 | 20/08/1938 | 15 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1940 | 25/05/1940 | 29 days | General | SW cab fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1942 | 12/09/1942 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1944 | 11/11/1944 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8185 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1946 | 26/10/1946 | 15 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1948 | 23/08/1948 | 44 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63928 |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1950 | 07/03/1950 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1951 | 01/02/1951 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 21013 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1952 | 03/05/1952 | 84 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/05/1953 | 30/06/1953 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 21014 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1955 | 28/06/1955 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 21003 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/11/1957 | 04/01/1958 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/09/1959 | 24/09/1959 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1961 | 15/07/1961 | 44 days | General | Rebuilt to class O2/4 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) | New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196108 |
16/07/1961 | Doncaster MPD | Ex works (36A) D3252, 60161, 63928. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 483 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22697 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
14/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1923. Dep: 07/11/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 483N |
||
05/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3483 | ||
18/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1925. Dep: 26/03/1926. | ||
29/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1928. Dep: 18/05/1928. | ||
11/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1930. Dep: 08/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7236 (Diagram 2) |
||
26/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1932. Dep: 23/04/1932. | ||
16/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1934. Dep: 14/07/1934. | ||
11/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8973 (Diagram 2) |
||
06/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1938. Dep: 20/08/1938. | ||
27/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940. Work undertaken: SW cab fitted |
||
15/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1942. Dep: 12/09/1942. | ||
06/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
07/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8185 (Diagram 2) |
||
17/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
09/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
01/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3928 | ||
12/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946. | ||
24/11/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
11/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1948. Dep: 23/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63928 |
||
26/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/02/1950. Dep: 07/03/1950. | ||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
09/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1951. Dep: 01/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21013 (Diagram 2) |
||
10/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/02/1952. Dep: 03/05/1952. | ||
21/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1953. Dep: 30/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21014 (Diagram 2) |
||
18/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1955. Dep: 28/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21003 (Diagram 2) |
||
29/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1957. Dep: 04/01/1958. | ||
10/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1959. Dep: 24/09/1959. | ||
02/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1961. Dep: 15/07/1961. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O2/4 |
||
26/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
08/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63928 from Grantham (34F) | ||
02/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |